Accounts and annual returns STOMACH CANCER AWARENESS NETWORK

Charity number: 1071188
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 29 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 29 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 29 September 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 29 September 2004 15 August 2005 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2004 Not Required