Financial history HEALTHY PRESTATYN IACH LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity Number: 1073398
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £6.47k £22.43k £14.04k £10.39k £10.00k
Total expenditure £5.81k £6.39k £25.55k £9.62k £10.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A