Financial history POULTON PENGUINS

Charity number: 1072860
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/07/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009
Total gross income £60.99k £2.10k £4.09k £0 £0
Total expenditure £66.76k £16.18k £4.09k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A