Accounts and annual returns WOOLSTON AND WOOLSTON ADVENTURE PRESCHOOLS

Charity number: 1072637
Charity reporting is overdue by 1039 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 308 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 308 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 674 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 674 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1039 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1039 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 March 2020 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 March 2020 49 days late Download Open in new window