Financial history CARERS SUPPORT (GUILDFORD)

Charity number: 1071612
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £54.80k £101.87k £78.86k £77.32k £0
Total expenditure £62.17k £73.40k £79.96k £82.33k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A