Accounts and annual returns CHORLEY LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1071904
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 May 2022 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 February 2022 287 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 23 July 2020 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required