Accounts and annual returns SPIRIT OF YOUTH

Charity number: 1076382
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 31 December 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 24 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 24 September 2011 236 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required