Trustees THE ALSAGER & DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1072030
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Bell | Chair | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pui Ki Regina Lo | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Elizabeth Butler | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Celia Hudson | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Gaston | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Dalton | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Bell | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Butler-Meadows | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.