Accounts and annual returns THE MENTOR FOUNDATION (UK) FOR THE PREVENTION OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE

Charity number: 1072619
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 17 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 15 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 15 June 2005 On Time