Financial history STEVENAGE AND NORTH HERTFORDSHIRE CHILD CONTACT CENTRES

Charity number: 1071704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.96k £10.17k £15.11k £18.74k £15.22k
Total expenditure £18.99k £10.45k £15.60k £18.68k £15.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A