Financial history RAMGARHIA BOARD LEICESTER & LEICESTERSHIRE

Charity Number: 1081931
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.01m £336.92k £573.63k £704.62k £1.14m
Total expenditure £314.35k £213.53k £268.25k £432.63k £816.07k
Income from government contracts £6.34k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.34k N/A £1.73k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £335.25k N/A £388.93k £529.97k £878.32k
Income - Other trading activities £38.24k N/A £42.00k £42.00k £47.95k
Income - Charitable activities £182.75k N/A £117.69k £132.64k £210.66k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £97 N/A £1 £6 £41
Income - Other £452.92k N/A £25.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £160.16k N/A £150.64k £270.33k £434.71k
Expenditure - Raising funds £154.19k N/A £117.60k £162.30k £381.36k
Expenditure - Governance £11.28k N/A £0 £0 £9.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0