Financial history Helping Herts Homeless

Charity number: 1071610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £41.99k £37.86k £39.25k £33.58k £59.89k
Total expenditure £34.27k £28.69k £33.23k £18.87k £35.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A