Financial history TOMAR OWL SANCTUARY

Charity Number: 1072826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £8.24k £2.32k £6.17k £6.01k £8.01k
Total expenditure £11.62k £10.12k £10.20k £9.05k £10.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A