Financial history DERRINGTON MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1071578
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £11.20k £84.19k £10.68k £7.09k £31.49k
Total expenditure £7.92k £20.44k £19.59k £20.35k £5.78k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A £5.00k