Financial history PANCRASWEEK VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1071815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.47k £18.67k £9.24k £6.65k £3.18k
Total expenditure £4.40k £13.27k £15.27k £8.27k £5.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.10k N/A N/A N/A