Governing document BUXTON & DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1072478
Up to date
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED ON 12 APRIL 1999, AS AMENDED ON 19TH APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED ON 13/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 24 Aug 2020 as amended on 12 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BUXTON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.