Financial history BROCKDISH NEW VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1071921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.99k £20.51k £11.26k £4.28k £9.89k
Total expenditure £3.02k £3.81k £4.96k £8.05k £13.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k £8.00k N/A N/A