Accounts and annual returns OLDHAM KICKSTART PROJECT

Charity number: 1075835
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 13 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 21 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required