Governing document RAUF R DENKTAS TURKISH SCHOOL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/07/1999 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/2008 AS AMENDED ON 19/06/2010 AS AMENDED ON 15/09/2012 as amended on 11 Sep 2021 as amended on 30 Sep 2020 as amended on 14 Jan 2022 as amended on 02 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP EDUCATION IN TURKISH LANGUAGE AND CULTURE AND IN SUCH OTHER SUBJECTS AS THE ASSOCIATION MAY, THROUGH ITS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE, FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, TRAINING AND FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS SO AS TO HELP THEM GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BEXLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.