Accounts and annual returns N B C T LIMITED

Charity number: 1076316
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 March 2022 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 June 2020 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required