Financial history CHAPEL ALLERTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1072347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.96k £7.09k £9.80k £14.16k £16.71k
Total expenditure £5.29k £8.32k £5.27k £18.79k £12.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A