Accounts and annual returns HIGH ASH CE COMBINED SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1072367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 22 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 06 September 2024 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 06 September 2024 98 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 29 January 2024 243 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 06 September 2024 464 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 08 February 2023 253 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required