Financial history CALVARY FELLOWSHIP OTLEY

Charity number: 1073386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.79k £12.77k £16.42k £12.42k £12.53k
Total expenditure £12.41k £12.09k £13.35k £13.44k £14.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A