Financial history HOME-START BURY METRO

Charity Number: 1079044
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2005 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009
Total gross income £123.80k £64.06k £138.65k £106.63k £91.68k
Total expenditure £92.17k £96.22k £71.62k £98.65k £75.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A