Accounts and annual returns THE HEMERDON RECREATION CLUB

Charity number: 1074563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 05 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 09 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required