Accounts and annual returns HUMAN BSE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1098572
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 15 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 22 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 15 September 2008 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 10 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 11 April 2007 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 12 April 2007 71 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 18 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 03 October 2005 On Time