Accounts and annual returns SEEDS FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1075563
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 14 June 2009 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 08 September 2009 220 days late
Annual return 31 October 2006 21 September 2007 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 26 September 2007 26 days late
Annual return 31 October 2005 25 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 25 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2004 04 August 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 04 August 2005 On Time