Accounts and annual returns LUTON CARIBBEAN MULTI-CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1079472
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 23 June 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2004 05 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required