Financial history CLITHEROE TOWN BAND

Charity number: 1076835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.42k £830 £658 £3.76k £2.27k
Total expenditure £1.88k £2.17k £758 £1.94k £2.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A