Financial history KIVETON PARK AND WALES COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1075184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £151.05k £184.20k £143.54k £110.23k £183.28k
Total expenditure £104.78k £132.41k £117.55k £124.15k £162.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.47k £18.88k N/A N/A