Accounts and annual returns THE MICHAEL BADMINTON YOUNG MUSICIANS TRUST

Charity number: 1076384
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 23 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 23 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 23 April 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 23 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 23 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 23 April 2006 29 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 23 April 2005 15 August 2006 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 April 2005 Not Required