Governing document MALPAS YOUNG PERSONS PROJECT

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED 28 SEPTEMBER 1999, 11 SEPTEMBER 2002, 9 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 14 JANUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE YOUNG PERSONS OF MALPAS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHIN THE COUNTY OF CHESHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THEIR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 2. ESTABLISH OR SECURE A YOUTH CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY (IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT). THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
MALPAS AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.