Financial history TOLLGATE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1073362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.22k £1.96k £925 £1.72k £1.35k
Total expenditure £2.61k £1.85k £1.13k £1.67k £1.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A