Accounts and annual returns COLSTERWORTH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1073367
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 25 January 2009 86 days late
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 26 January 2009 453 days late
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 27 January 2009 819 days late
Annual return 31 December 2004 11 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required