Accounts and annual returns BLESSED MOTHER TERESA PARENT TEACHER FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074504
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 November 2017 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required