Trustees THE FILM PLACE
Charity number: 1075315

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Geoffrey Dalzell | Chair | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gaelle Claire Hull | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Niall Ian David Brash | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lillian White | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Caroline Pringle | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Hoare | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.