Accounts and annual returns CATHOLIC CHARISMATIC RENEWAL HOLY SPIRIT PRAYER GROUP

Charity Number: 1078414
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 January 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 12 January 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 12 January 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 12 January 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 12 January 2017 25 May 2018 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 11 January 2016 10 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 January 2016 Not Required