Accounts and annual returns GARTMORE RIDING SCHOOL RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1073791
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 03 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 09 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2015 19 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2014 19 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not Required