Accounts and annual returns BURCOTT AND DISTRICT RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074206
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 11 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required