Accounts and annual returns THE CONNIE AND ALBERT TAYLOR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1074785
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 18 October 2016 On Time