Accounts and annual returns TAMESIDE DISPERSED FOYER PROJECT

Charity number: 1076965
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2006 29 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 29 September 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 27 September 2006 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 27 September 2006 239 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not submitted