Financial history MAJI MAZURI SOCIAL ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT SERVICES, KENYA

Charity number: 1080544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £25.73k £11.10k £7.20k £4.62k £3.46k
Total expenditure £6.57k £24.05k £0 £9.50k £9.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A