Accounts and annual returns THE CLUB 2000 SPORTS AND LEISURE CLUB FOR THE DISABLED

Charity number: 1077511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required