Financial history SAKOBA DANCE FOR ALL

Charity Number: 1077302
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £28.80k £75.15k £68.33k £26.90k £16.25k
Total expenditure £30.53k £70.96k £65.08k £32.52k £15.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A