Financial history DIVINE SOLUTION MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1078438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £76.27k £97.42k £111.62k £133.00k £110.76k
Total expenditure £74.23k £87.02k £113.11k £111.62k £123.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A