Accounts and annual returns DERBY WEST DIVISION GUIDES

Charity number: 1075278
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 26 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 29 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 12 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 12 June 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 08 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 08 May 2008 On Time