Accounts and annual returns ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION CAMBERLEY AND BAGSHOT BRANCH NO.924

Charity number: 1075301
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required