THE EAST LANCASHIRE HOSPICE

Charity number: 1075653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide specialist palliative and supportive care for the residents of Blackburn, Darwen, Hyndburn and the Ribble Valley. We aim to enhance the quality of life for people who have a life limiting illness and their families. Access to our facilities is free, whether in the hospice, the community or in their own home. Specialist resources are also available to other providers of palliative care

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Blackburn With Darwen
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 1999: Standard registration
  • 20 June 2012: Funds received from 248065 YERBURGH FUND FOR INCURABLES
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR FREDERICK GRAHAM PARR Chair 12 October 2010
COLDWELL INN PROJECT
Received: On time
Steve Almond Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
Paul Hinnigan Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
Lianne Robinson Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
Ismail Hafeji Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
DAVID McDONOUGH Trustee 09 January 2018
None on record
THOMAS KENNEDY Trustee 13 April 2010
T.H.O.M.A.S (THOSE ON THE MARGINS OF A SOCIETY)
Received: 44 days late
MRS GILLIAN MARY LEACY Trustee 08 June 2004
None on record
YUSUF JAN-VIRMANI Cllr Trustee 10 August 1999
BOROUGH OF BLACKBURN COMMON GOOD TRUST
Received: On time
RICHARD JOHN SUTLIEFF Trustee 13 April 1999
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.38m £4.05m £3.82m £3.49m £3.70m
Total expenditure £3.92m £3.44m £3.61m £4.02m £4.45m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.49m £2.53m £1.60m £1.72m £1.64m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.11m £497.20k £605.70k £471.50k £665.64k
Income - Other trading activities £1.37m £790.46k £1.05m £1.08m £1.08m
Income - Charitable activities £1.72m £1.67m £1.70m £1.83m £1.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £94.15k £63.98k £64.18k £102.99k £162.55k
Income - Other £80.00k £1.03m £398.81k £0 £108.87k
Income - Legacies £809.88k £187.32k £304.50k £182.78k £423.76k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.10m £2.80m £2.86m £3.30m £3.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £823.83k £647.49k £750.18k £717.00k £725.92k
Expenditure - Governance £18.20k £19.40k £23.68k £35.61k £23.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £25.77k £25.77k £29.65k £27.12k £27.12k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.75m £1.65m £1.61m £1.52m £1.46m
Long-term investments £7.78m £9.65m £12.06m £11.72m £13.08m
Other assets £3.92m £4.62m £3.37m £2.84m £2.15m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £765.98k £784.48k £828.44k £783.83k £847.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
East Lancashire Hospice
Park Lee Road
Blackburn
BB2 3NY
Phone:
01254 965830