Financial history KILSBY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1077904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £5.48k £3.98k £4.78k £8.07k £9.06k
Total expenditure £3.11k £5.11k £2.24k £7.65k £7.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A