Trustees ALL SAINTS LEIGHTON BUZZARD PRESERVATION TRUST
Charity number: 1077207

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Edwards | Chair | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev David John Lamont MacGeoch | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Steven Robert Lakin | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Rebecca Bradley | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Booth | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ELIZABETH KERR | Trustee | 19 February 2003 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.